Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mariano Cuartero y Sierra, O.A.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nueva Segovia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1830BornZaragoza, Spain
24 Sep 185020.7ProfessedMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
19 Feb 185323.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
16 Jan 187444.0AppointedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
6 Jun 187545.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
2 Aug 188757.6DiedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Mariano Cuartero y Sierra:
Bishop Mariano Cuartero y Sierra O.A.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Nueva Segovia

  • a priest for 34.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 419
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1868, Page 41, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 30 Oct 2013