Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel García San Esteban, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1727Born
19 Sep 176841.1AppointedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
26 Nov 176942.3Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
11 Nov 177952.3DiedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Miguel García San Esteban
Bishop Miguel García San Esteban O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Nueva Segovia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillar de Domingo García, Spain

  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 86, Number 436
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1769, Number 27
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 314

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast