Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Callanta Sison

Deceased

Archbishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1912Born
29 Mar 193623.6Ordained PriestPriest
10 May 194734.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
10 May 194734.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Limata
25 Jul 194734.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Limata
20 Aug 195644.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
20 Aug 195644.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicopsis
12 Oct 196654.1SucceededArchbishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
12 Sep 198169.0DiedArchbishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Juan Callanta Sison
Archbishop Juan Callanta Sison (born , died ) Archbishop of Nueva Segovia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillasis

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1947, Number 74
  • mn: CB, 22 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast