Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Isauro Alzate Buenafe

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines

Titular Bishop of Meta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1938Born
30 Mar 196324.4Ordained PriestPriest of Bangued, Philippines
9 Feb 197637.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
9 Feb 197637.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Meta
30 Mar 197637.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Meta
7 May 197637.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Antonio Isauro Alzate Buenafe
Bishop Antonio Isauro Alzate Buenafe (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Nueva Segovia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTayum

  • a priest for 13.1 years
  • a bishop for .1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • mn: CB, 20 Jul 2015
  • dio: CB, 22 Aug 2015
  • opd: CB, 23 Aug 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast