Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Jaro

Archidioecesis Iarensis o S. Elisabeth



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 29 June 1951
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Philippines
  • Square Kilometers: 5,304 (2,048 Square Miles)
  • Description: Comprises the entire province of Iloilo
  • Official Web Site: https://www.rcajaro.com
  • Mailing Address: National Shrine of Our Lady of Candles Parish, Jaro, 5000 Iloilo City, Philippines
  • Telephone: (033)329-1625
  • Fax: 329-3456

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Jaro o Santa Elisabetta
27 May 1865ErectedDiocese of Cebu Diocese of Jaro o Santa Elisabetta (erected)
10 April 1910Territory LostDiocese of Jaro o Santa Elisabetta Prefecture Apostolic of Palawan (erected)
10 April 1910Territory LostDiocese of Cebu
Diocese of Jaro o Santa Elisabetta
Diocese of Zamboanga (erected)
15 July 1932Territory LostDiocese of Cebu (Siqujior island)
Diocese of Jaro o Santa Elisabetta (Negros island along with small islands to the East)
Diocese of Bacolod (erected)
28 April 1934Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Jaro o Santa Elisabetta (from Manila)
2 July 1936Territory LostDiocese of Jaro o Santa Elisabetta (Maestre de Campo)
Diocese of Lipa (Lubang, islands located in front of Calapan, Bacò, and Puerto Galera; island of Apo; islands of Hin, Remirara, Sibay, and Caluyo, islands of Masin, Tambazon, and Buyallao)
Prefecture Apostolic of Mindoro (erected)
27 January 1951Territory LostDiocese of Jaro o Santa Elisabetta (Capiz and Romblòn) Diocese of Capiz (erected)
Archdiocese of Jaro
29 June 1951ElevatedDiocese of Jaro o Santa Elisabetta Archdiocese of Jaro
25 March 1953Territory AddedVicariate Apostolic of Calapan (Islands of Semirara, Calauya, Sibay, Libaton, Sibilon, and Libigao) Archdiocese of Jaro
24 March 1962Territory LostArchdiocese of Jaro Territorial Prelature of San Jose de Antique (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Jaro o Santa Elisabetta
19501,347,6001,575,80085.5%174302046,6058124121ap1951
Archdiocese of Jaro
1970997,8821,231,52781.0%115611765,6696510966ap1971
19801,246,0001,392,00089.5%112391518,2514442472ap1981
19901,487,0001,660,00089.6%139451848,0816445477ap1991
19991,817,7001,954,51793.0%154582128,5749940885ap2000
20001,854,0541,993,60793.0%167522198,4669442785ap2001
20011,889,1442,053,41892.0%171502218,5488641586ap2002
20021,945,8182,115,02092.0%172502228,7649041586ap2003
20032,004,1922,178,47092.0%172442169,2787542188ap2004
20042,054,2962,232,93192.0%167442119,7368432788ap2005
20062,104,4022,287,39392.0%179502299,18913849492ap2007
20132,460,4702,867,71385.8%168852539,72511937392ap2014
20162,641,9653,177,46283.1%1738325610,32012152392ap2017
20192,956,6043,520,66784.0%1727224412,11711049993ap2020
20213,010,0003,621,00083.1%1666222813,2018734694ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Jaro o Santa Elisabetta
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 27, Page 263, and Page 264
  • Archdiocese of Jaro
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 44, Page 463, to Page 167
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 45, Page 558, and Page 559

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.7, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 19 May 2024