Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edmundo Madarang Abaya

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Nueva Segovia, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1929Born
21 Mar 195324.1Ordained PriestPriest of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
11 Dec 197849.8AppointedBishop of Laoag, Philippines
19 Jan 197950.0Ordained BishopBishop of Laoag, Philippines
31 Jan 197950.0InstalledBishop of Laoag, Philippines
22 May 199970.3AppointedArchbishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
12 Feb 200576.0RetiredArchbishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
20 Sep 201889.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Nueva Segovia, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Edmundo Madarang Abaya
Archbishop Edmundo Madarang Abaya (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Nueva Segovia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCandon
Death PlaceCardinal Santos Medical Center, San Juan City

  • a priest for 65.4 years
  • a bishop for 39.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • mn: CB, 15 Jul 2015
  • d: CB, 20 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 21 Sep 2018

Quantcast