Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan José Aragonés, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1816Born
4 Nov 186448.2SelectedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
27 Mar 186548.5ConfirmedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
1 Oct 186549.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
14 Aug 187255.9DiedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Juan José Aragonés
Bishop Juan José Aragonés O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Nueva Segovia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Spain
Ordained BishopSt. Paul, Manila, Archdiocese of Manila

  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 419
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 172, Number 947
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1865, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast