Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Hevía y Campomanes, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Badajoz, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1841Born
17 Sep 185716.4ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
21 May 186423.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
27 May 188948.1AppointedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
13 Apr 189049.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
12 Jun 190362.2ResignedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
25 Jun 190362.2AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
2 May 190463.1DiedBishop of Badajoz, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Hevía y Campomanes (VIAF: 315088519)
Bishop José Hevía y Campomanes O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Badajoz

EventPlace
Birth PlacePola de Lena, Diocese of Oviedo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Oviedo, Diocese of Oviedo

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 419
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 May 2017