Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Pizaro de Orellana

Deceased

Bishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1630¹Born
22 Feb 168050.1SelectedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
27 May 168050.4ConfirmedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
1681¹51.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
2 Sep 168353.6DiedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Pizaro de Orellana
Bishop Francisco Pizaro de Orellana (born 1630, died ) Bishop of Nueva Segovia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManila

  • a bishop for 2.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 292
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1681, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast