Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Gatan Purugganan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ilagan, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1931Born
3 Mar 195725.2Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jan 197139.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
23 Jan 197139.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Egnatia
22 Apr 197139.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Egnatia
21 Jan 197442.1AppointedBishop of Ilagan, Philippines
26 Jul 199967.6ResignedBishop of Ilagan, Philippines
7 Jul 201179.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Ilagan, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Miguel Gatan Purugganan
Bishop Miguel Gatan Purugganan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ilagan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCabagan

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 40.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 8 Jul 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast