Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cayetano Pallás, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nueva Segovia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1750BornBenabarre
6 Oct 180656.0AppointedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
18 Sep 180858.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
Dec 1814²64.2DiedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cayetano Pallás:
Bishop Cayetano Pallás O.P. (born ) Bishop of Nueva Segovia

  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,086
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 287
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 128, Number 681
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1808, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015