Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Tuguegarao

Archidioecesis Tuguegaraoanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Sergio Lasam Utleg, Archbishop
  • Ricardo Lingan Baccay, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Diosdado Aenlle Talamayan, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 21 September 1974
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Philippines
  • Square Kilometers: 9,000 (3,476 Square Miles)
  • Description: Comprises most of the province of Cagayan
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, Rizal Street, Tuguegarao City, 3500 Cagayan, Philippines
  • Telephone: (078)844-1663
  • Fax: 846-2822

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Tuguegarao
10 April 1910ErectedDiocese of Tuguegarao (erected)
30 November 1950Territory LostDiocese of Tuguegarao Territorial Prelature of Batanes and the Babuyan Islands (erected)
Archdiocese of Tuguegarao
21 September 1974ElevatedDiocese of Tuguegarao Archdiocese of Tuguegarao

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Tuguegarao
1950500,000673,55074.2%4128697,246315052ap1951
1970467,806553,56784.5%4119607,7966736ap1971
Archdiocese of Tuguegarao
1980574,687696,52282.5%3827658,841297736ap1981
1990715,000875,00081.7%50217110,070219837ap1991
1999930,8601,095,13085.0%56167212,928169539ap2000
2000963,7151,204,64380.0%54146814,172148939ap2001
2001992,6261,240,78280.0%58116914,385118939ap2002
20021,033,3231,291,65480.0%57116815,195118539ap2003
20031,086,7221,358,40280.0%56136915,749139839ap2004
20041,259,6101,488,09884.6%60187816,1481810142ap2005
20101,356,0001,709,00079.3%60228216,536249846ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 25 Jul 2014