Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvador Lazo Lazo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Fernando de La Union


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1918BornFaire Santo Niņo
22 Mar 194728.8Ordained PriestPriest of Tuguegarao, Philippines
1 Dec 196951.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tuguegarao, Philippines
1 Dec 196951.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Selia
3 Feb 197051.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Selia
3 Aug 197759.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
20 Jan 198162.7AppointedBishop of San Fernando de La Union, Philippines
28 May 199375.0RetiredBishop of San Fernando de La Union, Philippines
11 Apr 200081.9DiedBishop Emeritus of San Fernando de La Union, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Salvador Lazo Lazo:
Bishop Salvador Lazo Lazo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Fernando de La Union

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/ab: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015