Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan García Ruiz, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nueva Segovia

Note/Previous Titular See: (Juan de San Agustín)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1728BornMadridejo, Spain
25 Jun 178456.1AppointedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
12 Mar 178657.8Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
2 May 179667.9DiedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Juan García Ruiz:
Bishop Juan García Ruiz O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Nueva Segovia

  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 104, Number 541
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 314
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 287

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013