Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Baguio

Dioecesis Baghiopolitanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Carlito J. Cenzon, C.I.C.M., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 24 June 2004
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Nueva Segovia
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Philippines
  • Square Kilometers: 2,655 (1,025 Square Miles)
  • Description: Comprises the city of Baguio and the civil province of Benguet
  • Official Web Site: http://dioceseofbaguio.com/
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's Residence, P.O. Box 55, Father Carlu Loop, Kabayanihan Brgy., 2600 Baguio City, Philippines
  • Telephone: (074)442-3756
  • Fax: 442-5748

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Mountain Provinces
15 July 1932ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Mountain Provinces (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Mountain Provinces (Montagnosa)
10 June 1948ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Mountain Provinces Vicariate Apostolic of Mountain Provinces (Montagnosa)
6 July 1992Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Mountain Provinces (Montagnosa) Vicariate Apostolic of Bontoc-Lagawe (erected)
6 July 1992Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Mountain Provinces (Montagnosa) Vicariate Apostolic of Tabuk (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Baguio
6 July 1992Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Mountain Provinces (Montagnosa) Vicariate Apostolic of Baguio
Diocese of Baguio
24 June 2004ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Baguio Diocese of Baguio

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Mountain Provinces (Montagnosa)
195099,229290,68734.1%151521,908917726ap1951
1970289,400512,60056.5%179803,61781319ap1971
1980438,000749,86558.4%2867954,610220297ap1981
1990545,758930,51058.7%3547826,65514128646ap1991
Vicariate Apostolic of Baguio
1999509,766778,89765.4%3033638,09115322221ap2000
2000517,739789,45465.6%3427618,48713325822ap2001
2001349,581582,51560.0%3522576,1338426722ap2002
2002387,342595,91265.0%3620566,9161479822ap2003
2003385,627582,51566.2%383419,4054710323ap2004
Diocese of Baguio
2004398,810594,70467.1%394439,27410510524ap2005
2006416,000621,00067.0%3374010,4001074526ap2007
2012509,242701,00072.6%4227697,38011714726ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 30 Dec 2013