Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Peter Joseph Hurth, C.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nueva Segovia, Philippines

Titular Archbishop of Bostra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1857Born
19 Mar 187618.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of Holy Cross
30 Mar 188023.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Holy Cross
26 Jun 189437.2AppointedBishop of Dacca, Bangladesh
16 Sep 189437.4Ordained BishopBishop of Dacca, Bangladesh
15 Feb 190951.8ResignedBishop of Dacca, Bangladesh
15 Feb 190951.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Eleutherna
7 Jan 191355.7AppointedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
12 Nov 192669.6RetiredBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
12 Nov 192669.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Bostra
1 Aug 193578.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Nueva Segovia, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Peter Joseph Hurth (VIAF: 41081696)
Archbishop Peter Joseph Hurth C.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nueva Segovia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNittel am Mosel, Diocese of Trier, Germany
Ordained BishopSacred Heart, Notre-Dame, South Bend, IN, Diocese of Fort Wayne, Indiana, USA

  • a priest for 55.3 years
  • a bishop for 40.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1936
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 237
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017