Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfredo Verzosa y Florentin

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lipa

Titular Bishop of Capsa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1877BornVigan
24 Dec 190427.0Ordained PriestPriest
6 Sep 191638.7AppointedBishop of Lipa, Philippines
20 Jan 191739.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lipa, Philippines
1926²48.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
1927²49.1ResignedApostolic Administrator of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
25 Feb 195173.2RetiredBishop of Lipa, Philippines
25 Feb 195173.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Capsa
27 Jun 195476.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Lipa, Philippines

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfredo Verzosa y Florentin:
Bishop Alfredo Verzosa y Florentin (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lipa

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 37.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013