Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Figueroa Gómez

Bishop of Granada en Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1946 BornBucaramanga
9 Sep 197226.3Ordained PriestPriest of Barrancabermeja, Colombia
8 Aug 200256.2AppointedBishop of Granada en Colombia
12 Oct 200256.4Ordained BishopBishop of Granada en Colombia
2 Feb 201063.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of San José del Guaviare, Colombia
11 Mar 201164.8CeasedApostolic Administrator of San José del Guaviare, Colombia
27 Jul 201569.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of San José del Guaviare, Colombia
18 Jun 201670.1CeasedApostolic Administrator of San José del Guaviare, Colombia

MicroData Summary for José Figueroa Gómez
Bishop José Figueroa Gómez (born ) Bishop of Granada en Colombia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Granada en Colombia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,275
  • ab: CB, 27 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 26 May 2016