Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Vittorio Veneto

Dioecesis Victoriensis Venetorum



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Corrado Pizziolo, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 13 May 1939
  • Metropolitan: Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}
  • Depends on: Dicastery for Bishops
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 1,420 (548 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Triveneto
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesivittorioveneto.it/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Vescovile, Via Lorenzo Da Ponte 116, 31029 Vittorio Veneto [Treviso], Italia
  • Telephone: 0438.94.82.13
  • Fax: 0438.94.82.14

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Ceneda
6th CenturyErectedDiocese of Ceneda (erected)
6 July 1751Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Ceneda (from Aquileia to Udine)
10 January 1925Territory AddedDiocese of Concordia (Sagittaria) (Riviera Antonio Scarpa) Diocese of Ceneda
16 April 1926Territory AddedArchdiocese of Udine (S. Nicolò in Sacile) Diocese of Ceneda
Diocese of Vittorio Veneto
13 May 1939Name ChangedDiocese of Ceneda Diocese of Vittorio Veneto

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Ceneda
1886174,416.0%2370128OTC
Diocese of Vittorio Veneto
1950286,440286,480100.0%352102454630198870163ap1951
1970277,896278,14499.9%34682428649119974175ap1971
1980297,787300,38799.1%33299431690129972180ap1981
1990300,000304,00098.7%300983987536122842162ap1991
1999298,000301,00099.0%283803638201198763162ap2000
2000306,000314,00097.5%264903548649105655162ap2001
2001304,400314,00096.9%2649035485910107589162ap2002
2002319,400327,00097.7%263783419361186582162ap2003
2003319,400327,60097.5%256783349561187700162ap2004
2004313,200327,80095.5%245733189841180711162ap2005
2010335,500364,87092.0%211562671,2562265563162ap2011
2014334,000351,20095.1%207632701,2373685539162ap2015
2017340,000357,60095.1%207632701,2593685539162ap2018
2020354,330377,28093.9%159512101,6873162355162ap2021
2022326,000376,00086.7%152662181,4953679276162ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Ceneda
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 180
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 124
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 162
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 144, and Page 145
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 153
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 158, and Page 159
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 783, to Page 784
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 17, Page 139
  • Diocese of Vittorio Veneto
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 31, Page 370

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 25 Mar 2024