Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Alejandro Castaño Arbeláez, O.A.R.

Bishop of Cartago, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1945 Born
28 Jan 196721.8Solemn VowsMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
8 Dec 197126.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
13 Nov 200661.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cali, Colombia
13 Nov 200661.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Castellum Tatroportus
27 Jan 200761.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castellum Tatroportus
21 Oct 201065.5AppointedBishop of Cartago, Colombia
27 Nov 201065.6InstalledBishop of Cartago, Colombia

MicroData Summary for José Alejandro Castaño Arbeláez
Bishop José Alejandro Castaño Arbeláez O.A.R. (born ) Bishop of Cartago

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Ceja

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cartago.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Nov 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,325
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Oct 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Jun 2017