Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Felipe Sánchez Aponte

Bishop of Chiquinquirá, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1947 Born
28 Sep 197326.3Ordained PriestPriest of Garagoa, Colombia
11 Feb 200456.7AppointedBishop of Chiquinquirá, Colombia
22 Apr 200456.9Ordained BishopBishop of Chiquinquirá, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Luis Felipe Sánchez Aponte
Bishop Luis Felipe Sánchez Aponte (born ) Bishop of Chiquinquirá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSamacá

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chiquinquirá.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,578

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast