Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victor Antonio Tamayo Betancourt

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Barranquilla, Colombia

Titular Bishop of Voncariana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1937 Born
20 Dec 196427.4Ordained PriestPriest of Barranquilla, Colombia
12 Dec 200366.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Barranquilla, Colombia
12 Dec 200366.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Voncariana
24 Jan 200466.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Voncariana
14 Nov 201780.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Barranquilla, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Victor Antonio Tamayo Betancourt
Bishop Victor Antonio Tamayo Betancourt (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Barranquilla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnori
Ordained BishopMaria Reina, Cathedral, Barranquilla, Archdiocese of Barranquilla

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Barranquilla.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,517
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018