Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hernán Alvarado Solano

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Guapi, Colombia

Titular Bishop of Tubunae in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1946Born
4 Dec 197125.8Ordained PriestPriest of Zipaquirá, Colombia
13 Feb 200155.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Guapi, Colombia
13 Feb 200155.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tubunae in Mauretania
24 Mar 200155.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tubunae in Mauretania
31 Jan 201165.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Guapi, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Hernán Alvarado Solano
Bishop Hernán Alvarado Solano (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Guapi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantafé de Bogotá

  • a priest for 39.1 years
  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,945

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018