Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaime Enrique Duque Correa, M.X.Y. †

Deceased

Bishop of El Banco, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1943Born
5 Nov 196623.5ProfessedMember of Misioneros Javerianos de Yarumal
2 Jul 196724.2Ordained PriestPriest of Misioneros Javerianos de Yarumal
17 Jan 200662.7AppointedBishop of El Banco, Colombia
25 Feb 200662.8Ordained BishopBishop of El Banco, Colombia
14 Apr 201370.0DiedBishop of El Banco, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Jaime Enrique Duque Correa
Bishop Jaime Enrique Duque Correa M.X.Y. (born , died ) Bishop of El Banco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMedellín

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Jan 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,075
  • d: CB, 15 Apr 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast