Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcelo Arturo González Amador

Bishop of Santa Clara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1956 BornPlacetas
18 Dec 198327.9Ordained PriestPriest of Cienfuegos-Santa Clara, Cuba
31 Oct 199842.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santa Clara, Cuba
31 Oct 199842.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Segia
20 Dec 199842.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Segia
4 Jun 199943.4AppointedBishop of Santa Clara, Cuba
18 Jul 199943.5InstalledBishop of Santa Clara, Cuba

MicroData Summary for Marcelo Arturo González Amador:
Bishop Marcelo Arturo González Amador (born ) Bishop of Santa Clara

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Santa Clara.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,450
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013