Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Germán Mesa Ruiz

Bishop of Socorro y San Gil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1943 BornDuitama
11 Nov 196724.2Ordained PriestPriest of Tunja, Colombia
20 Mar 200359.5AppointedBishop of Arauca, Colombia
26 Apr 200359.6Ordained BishopBishop of Arauca, Colombia
3 May 200359.7InstalledBishop of Arauca, Colombia
2 Feb 201066.4AppointedBishop of Socorro y San Gil, Colombia
17 Apr 201066.6InstalledBishop of Socorro y San Gil, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Carlos Germán Mesa Ruiz:
Bishop Carlos Germán Mesa Ruiz (born ) Bishop of Socorro y San Gil

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Socorro y San Gil.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 171, Number 14,367

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013