Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas Huynh Van Nghi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Phan Thiết, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1927Born
20 Dec 195225.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Saigon, Viet Nam
29 Jun 195326.1Ordained PriestPriest of Saigon, Viet Nam
1 Jul 197447.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saigon, Viet Nam
1 Jul 197447.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Selsea
11 Aug 197447.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Selsea
19 Mar 197547.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Phan Thiết, Viet Nam
6 Dec 197952.5AppointedBishop of Phan Thiết, Viet Nam
1 Apr 200577.9RetiredBishop of Phan Thiết, Viet Nam
6 May 201588.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Phan Thiết, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Huynh Van Nghi
Bishop Nicolas Huynh Van Nghi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Phan Thiết

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVinh Hôi
Ordained DeaconSt-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 61.8 years
  • a bishop for 40.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142
  • d: CB, 7 May 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 8 Jul 2018

Quantcast