Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julius Sullan Tonel

Bishop of Ipil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1956 BornDavao City
12 Apr 198023.6Ordained PriestPriest of Davao, Philippines
30 Jun 200750.8AppointedPrelate of Ipil, Philippines
20 Aug 200751.0Ordained BishopPrelate of Ipil, Philippines
1 May 201053.7AppointedBishop of Ipil, Philippines
7 Aug 201053.9InstalledBishop of Ipil, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Julius Sullan Tonel:
Bishop Julius Sullan Tonel (born ) Bishop of Ipil

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ipil.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,491

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013