Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Ti-kang

Archbishop Emeritus of Taipei


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1928 BornSinsiang
20 Dec 195325.6Ordained PriestPriest of Taipei, Taiwan
21 Jun 197547.1AppointedBishop of Kiayi, Taiwan
22 Jul 197547.2Ordained BishopBishop of Kiayi, Taiwan
3 May 198557.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Taipei, Taiwan
11 Feb 198960.8SucceededArchbishop of Taipei, Taiwan
24 Jan 200475.7RetiredArchbishop of Taipei, Taiwan

MicroData Summary for Joseph Ti-kang:
Archbishop Joseph Ti-kang (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Taipei

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Taipei.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013