Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giulio Einaudi

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Croatia

Titular Archbishop of Villamagna in Tripolitana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1928Born
29 Jun 195123.3Ordained PriestPriest of Saluzzo, Italy
10 Nov 197648.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Villamagna in Tripolitana
10 Nov 197648.7AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Pakistan
2 Jan 197748.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Villamagna in Tripolitana
5 Aug 198052.4AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Cuba
23 Sep 198860.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Chile
29 Feb 199264.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Croatia
4 Aug 200375.4RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Croatia
28 Dec 201789.8DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Croatia

MicroData Summary for Giulio Einaudi (VIAF: 305477889)
Archbishop Giulio Einaudi (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Croatia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceS. Damiano Macra, Diocese of Saluzzo, Italy
Ordained PriestCathedral, Saluzzo, Diocese of Saluzzo, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Saluzzo, Diocese of Saluzzo, Italy
Death PlaceCuneo, Diocese of Cuneo, Italy

  • a priest for 66.4 years
  • a bishop for 40.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142
  • c1: CB, 10 Apr 2017
  • d: CB, 29 Dec 2017
  • loc: AM, 14 Jan 2018
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast