Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Mariano Cardinal Rampolla del Tindaro

Deceased

Secretary of the Congregation of the Holy Office

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia

Archpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}

Librarian of the Vatican Library


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1843Born
1866²22.3Ordained PriestPriest
16 Nov 188037.2AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
25 Oct 188239.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
1 Dec 188239.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa
8 Dec 188239.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa
14 Mar 188743.5Elevated to Cardinal
14 Mar 188743.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
26 May 188743.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
2 Jun 188743.7AppointedSecretary of State
21 Mar 189450.5AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}
1902²58.3AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Biblical Commission
20 Jul 190359.9CeasedSecretary of State
190864.3ResignedPresident of the Pontifical Biblical Commission
30 Dec 190865.3AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of the Holy Office
26 Nov 191269.2AppointedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
16 Dec 191370.3DiedSecretary of the Congregation of the Holy Office

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mariano Rampolla del Tindaro (VIAF: 41831104)
Mariano Cardinal Rampolla del Tindaro (born , died ) Secretary of Holy Office

EventPlace
Birth PlacePolizzi Generosa, Diocese of Cefalù, Italy
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Current)Santa Cecilia, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
  • a cardinal for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 302, and Page 47
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Mar 1887
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 66
  • xsta/x933/nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 13, and Page 23, and Page 239

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast