Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alessandro Cardinal Mattei

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Prefect of the Congregation of Ceremonies

Archpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1744BornRoma
27 Feb 176824.0Ordained PriestPriest
17 Feb 177732.9AppointedArchbishop of Ferrara, Italy
23 Feb 177733.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Ferrara, Italy
12 Jul 177935.3Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
22 May 178238.2Elevated to Cardinal
27 May 178238.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
3 Apr 178642.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
2 Apr 180056.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
27 Mar 180965.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
26 Sep 181470.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
14 Jun 181571.3AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Ceremonies
10 May 181773.2AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}
20 Apr 182076.1DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Mattei:
Alessandro Cardinal Mattei (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 43.1 years
  • a cardinal for 40.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Jul 1779
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1777, Number 3
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 215

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 26 Dec 2015