Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Luis Serna Alzate, I.M.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Líbano-Honda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1936BornAranzazu
23 Dec 196125.8Ordained PriestPriest of Consolata Missionaries
15 Nov 197842.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Florencia, Colombia
15 Nov 197842.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Cartennae
7 Dec 197842.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cartennae
9 Dec 198549.8AppointedBishop of Florencia, Colombia
8 Jul 198953.4AppointedBishop of Líbano-Honda, Colombia
12 Jul 200266.4ResignedBishop of Líbano-Honda, Colombia
28 Sep 201478.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Líbano-Honda, Colombia

MicroData Summary for José Luis Serna Alzate:
Bishop José Luis Serna Alzate I.M.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Líbano-Honda

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 35.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142
  • d: CB, 28 Sep 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 30 Sep 2014