Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Januário Machaze Nhangumbe

Bishop Emeritus of Pemba, Mozambique


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1934 Born
22 Dec 196228.3Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jan 197540.4AppointedBishop of Porto Amélia, Mozambique
9 Mar 197540.5Ordained BishopBishop of Porto Amélia, Mozambique
8 Nov 199359.2ResignedBishop of Pemba, Mozambique

MicroData Summary for Januário Machaze Nhangumbe
Bishop Januário Machaze Nhangumbe (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Pemba

EventPlace
Birth PlacePanda

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pemba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast