Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Irizar Campos, C.P.

Bishop Emeritus of Callao


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1934 BornOrmaiztegui, Spain
16 Mar 195722.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
25 Mar 197237.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Yurimaguas, Peru
25 Mar 197237.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Elo
25 Jul 197238.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elo
6 Aug 198955.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Callao, Peru
17 Aug 199561.2SucceededBishop of Callao, Peru
12 Dec 201177.5RetiredBishop of Callao, Peru

MicroData Summary for Miguel Irizar Campos:
Bishop Miguel Irizar Campos C.P. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Callao

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Callao.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015