Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Wang Yu-jung

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Taichung, Taiwan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1931Born
24 Dec 195524.6Ordained PriestPriest of Taipei, Taiwan
1 Jul 197544.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Taipei, Taiwan
1 Jul 197544.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Árd Sratha
22 Jul 197544.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Árd Sratha
25 Jun 198655.1AppointedBishop of Taichung, Taiwan
25 Jun 200776.1RetiredBishop of Taichung, Taiwan
18 Jan 201886.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Taichung, Taiwan

MicroData Summary for Joseph Wang Yu-jung
Bishop Joseph Wang Yu-jung (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Taichung

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShanghai
Ordained PriestMadrid, Diocese of Madrid, Spain
Death PlaceRongmin General, Hospital, Taichung, Diocese of Taichung
Buried Place (Original)Dadu Hill Public, Cemetery, Taichung, Diocese of Taichung

  • a priest for 62.0 years
  • a bishop for 42.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 25 Jan 2018