Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Method Kilaini

Auxiliary Bishop of Bukoba, Tanzania

Titular Bishop of Strumnitza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1948 Born
18 Mar 197223.9Ordained PriestPriest of Bukoba, Tanzania
22 Dec 199951.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Dar-es-Salaam, Tanzania
22 Dec 199951.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Strumnitza
18 Mar 200051.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Strumnitza
5 Dec 200961.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bukoba, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Method Kilaini
Bishop Method Kilaini (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bukoba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKatoma

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bukoba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,713

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast