Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pio Yukwan Deng

Deceased

Bishop of Malakal, South Sudan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1921Born
6 Jan 195635.0Ordained PriestPriest of Malakal, Sudan
19 Aug 196746.6AppointedPrefect of Malakal, Sudan
9 May 197453.3AppointedPrefect of Malakal, Sudan
12 Dec 197453.9AppointedBishop of Malakal, South Sudan
6 Apr 197554.2Ordained BishopBishop of Malakal, South Sudan
3 Dec 197655.9DiedBishop of Malakal, South Sudan

MicroData Summary for Pio Yukwan Deng
Bishop Pio Yukwan Deng (born , died ) Bishop of Malakal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAweci

  • a priest for 20.9 years
  • a bishop for 1.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast