Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Octavio da Pozzo

Deceased

Bishop of Catanzaro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1681BornCastellamare
22 Sep 170322.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
6 Jul 170423.0Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jul 173655.0AppointedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
15 Jul 173655.0Ordained BishopBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
6 Jan 175169.5DiedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Octavio da Pozzo:
Bishop Octavio da Pozzo (born , died ) Bishop of Catanzaro

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 155
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1736, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015