Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Silvestro Merani, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Porphyreon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1688BornLevanto
28 Feb 174253.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Porphyreon
4 Mar 174253.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Porphyreon
22 Jan 176475.5DiedTitular Bishop of Porphyreon

MicroData Summary for Silvestro Merani:
Bishop Silvestro Merani O.S.A. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Porphyreon

  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • c34: CB, 18 Jul 2014
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015