Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Rondoni

Deceased

Bishop of Assisi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1678BornBologna
29 May 170123.3Ordained PriestPriest
31 Mar 173254.2AppointedBishop of Assisi, Italy
6 Apr 173254.2Ordained BishopBishop of Assisi, Italy
12 Sep 173557.6DiedBishop of Assisi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Rondoni:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Rondoni (born , died ) Bishop of Assisi

  • a priest for 34.2 years
  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1733
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 102

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015