Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Francesco Cardinal Durini

Deceased

Bishop of Pavia

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1693BornMilano
3 Feb 172532.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 173946.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rhodus
5 Jul 173946.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Rhodus
1 Aug 173946.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
4 Jan 174450.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
29 Mar 174451.1ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
23 Jul 175360.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Pavia, Italy
Nov 1753³60.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
26 Nov 175360.8Elevated to Cardinal
16 Dec 175461.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
25 Jun 176976.4DiedBishop of Pavia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Francesco Durini (VIAF: 89085644)
Carlo Francesco Cardinal Durini (born , died ) Bishop of Pavia

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
  • a cardinal for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Nov 1753
  • ob/c2+: CB, 14 Jun 2011
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 20
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 242

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Nov 2016