Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Filippo Antonio San Martino

Deceased

Bishop of Asti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1711BornCastelnuovo
25 Feb 173624.5Ordained PriestPriest
25 May 175745.7SelectedBishop of Asti, Italy
18 Jul 175745.9ConfirmedBishop of Asti, Italy
25 Jul 175745.9Ordained BishopBishop of Asti, Italy
7 Jun 176149.8DiedBishop of Asti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Filippo Antonio San Martino:
Bishop Giovanni Filippo Antonio San Martino (born , died ) Bishop of Asti

  • a priest for 25.2 years
  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 104
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015