Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Tomaso de Rossi

Deceased

Bishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1708Born
6 Jan 173425.6Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jul 175749.1AppointedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
25 Jul 175749.1Ordained BishopBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
20 May 178677.9DiedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Tomaso de Rossi
Bishop Giuseppe Tomaso de Rossi (born , died ) Bishop of Alessandria (della Paglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCeva

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 75
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1757, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast