Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Maria Cardinal Erba-Odescalchi

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1712BornMilan, Italy
22 Sep 173624.6Ordained PriestPriest
24 Sep 175947.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
24 Sep 175947.6Elevated to Cardinal
14 Oct 175947.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
19 Nov 175947.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
28 Mar 176250.1DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Erba-Odescalchi:
Antonio Maria Cardinal Erba-Odescalchi (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro

  • a priest for 25.5 years
  • a bishop for 2.4 years
  • a cardinal for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Sep 1759
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015