Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Enrichetto Virginio (Raffale Francesco) Cardinal Natta, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Alba (Pompea)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1701BornCasale Monferrato
15 Jun 172625.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
22 Apr 175049.3SelectedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
22 Jul 175049.5ConfirmedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
25 Jul 175049.5Ordained BishopBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
23 Nov 176160.9Elevated to Cardinal
29 Jun 176867.5DiedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy

MicroData Summary for Enrichetto Virginio (Raffale Francesco) Natta:
Cardinal Enrichetto Virginio (Raffale Francesco) Natta O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Alba (Pompea)

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
  • a cardinal for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Nov 1761
  • ob/c2+: CB, 19 Jun 2011
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Sep 2013