Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Cardinal Pozzobonelli

Deceased

Archbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1696Born
23 Dec 173034.3Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jul 174346.9AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
21 Jul 174346.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
9 Sep 174347.0Elevated to Cardinal
23 Sep 174347.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via
2 Aug 175861.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
28 May 177073.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
27 Apr 178386.7DiedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Pozzobonelli (VIAF: 89080828)
Giuseppe Cardinal Pozzobonelli (born , died ) Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopSan Carlo al Corso, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 39.7 years
  • a cardinal for 39.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Sep 1743
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1743, Number 21
  • loc: AT, 29 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Jan 2017