Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Matteo Trigona

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Siracusa

Titular Archbishop of Iconium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1679³BornPiazza
22 Sep 170324.4Ordained PriestPriest
10 Nov 173152.5SelectedBishop of Siracusa, Italy
7 May 173253.0ConfirmedBishop of Siracusa, Italy
11 May 173253.0Ordained BishopBishop of Siracusa, Italy
10 Oct 174768.5ResignedBishop of Siracusa, Italy
1 Apr 174868.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Iconium
29 Jun 175475.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Siracusa, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Matteo Trigona:
Archbishop Matteo Trigona (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Siracusa

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 242, and Page 389
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1732, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015