Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Gallarati

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lodi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1695BornMilano
18 Apr 174247.0AppointedBishop of Lodi, Italy
25 Apr 174247.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lodi, Italy
14 Apr 176570.0ResignedBishop of Lodi, Italy
1 Jul 176772.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Lodi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Gallarati:
Bishop Giuseppe Gallarati (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lodi

  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 254
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1742, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015