Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Francesco Cardinal Stoppani

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1695BornMilano, Italy
25 Jul 173438.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 Aug 173438.8Ordained PriestPriest
14 Mar 173539.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
25 Mar 173539.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
15 Apr 173539.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
27 Feb 173943.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
Jun 1739³43.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
Nov 1743³48.1ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
26 Nov 175358.1Elevated to Cardinal
20 May 175458.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
10 Jul 176367.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
18 Nov 177479.1DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Francesco Stoppani (VIAF: 89085616)
Giovanni Francesco Cardinal Stoppani (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

  • a priest for 40.2 years
  • a bishop for 39.6 years
  • a cardinal for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Nov 1753
  • ob/c2+: CB, 14 Jun 2011
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1735, Number 7
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 263

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016